In this chapter, we provide RS Aggarwal Solutions for Class 6 Chapter 3 Whole Numbers Exercise 3D for English medium students, Which will very helpful for every student in their exams. Students can download the latest RS Aggarwal Solutions for Class 6 Chapter 3 Whole Numbers Exercise 3D pdf, free RS Aggarwal Solutions Class 6 Chapter 3 Whole Numbers Exercise 3D book pdf download. Now you will get step by step solution to each question.

Textbook | NCERT |

Class | Class 6 |

Subject | Maths |

Chapter | Chapter 3 |

Chapter Name | Whole Numbers |

Exercise | 3D |

Category | RS Aggarwal Solutions |

**RS Aggarwal Class 6 Chapter 3 Whole Numbers Ex 3D Download PDF**

**Question 1.****Solution:**

(i) 246 x 1 = 246

(By multiplicative property of 1)

(ii) 1369 x 0 = 0

(By multiplicative property of 0)

(iii) 593 x 188 = 188 x 593

(By commutative law of multiplication)

(iv) 286 x 753 = 753 x 286

(By commutative law of multiplication)

(v) 38 x (91 x 37) = 91 x (38 x 37)

(By associative law of multiplication)

(vi) 13 x 100 x 1000 = 1300000

(vii) 59 x 66 + 59 x 34 = 59 x (66 + 34)

(By distributive law of multiplication)

(vii) 68 x 95 = 68 x 100 – 68 x 5

**Question 2.****Solution:**

(i) Commutative law of multiplication

(ii) Closure property

(iii) Associative law of multiplication

(iv) Multiplicative property of 1

(v) Multiplicative property of 0

(vi) Distributive law of multiplication over addition in whole numbers

(vii) Distributive law of multiplication over subtraction in whole numbers

**Question 3.****Solution:**

Using the law of distribution over addition and subtraction

(i) 647 x 13 + 647 x 7

= 647 x (13 + 7)

= 647 x 20

= 12940

(ii) 8759 x 94 + 8759 x 6

= 8759 x (94 + 6)

= 8759 x 100

= 875900

(iii) 7459 x 999 + 7459

= 7459 x 999 + 7459 x 1

= 7459 x (999 + 1)

= 7459 x 1000

= 7459000

(iv) 9870 x 561 – 9870 x 461

= 9870 x (561 – 461)

= 9870 x 100

= 987000

(v) 569 x 17 + 569 x 13 + 569 x 70

= 569 x (17 + 13 + 70)

= 569 x 100

= 56900

(vi) 16825 x 16825 – 16825 x 6825

= 16825 x (16825 – 6825)

= 16825 x 10000

= 168250000

**Question 4.****Solution:**

(i) 2 x 1658 x 50 = 1658 x (2 x 50) (Associative law of multiplication)

= 1658 x 100

= 165800

(ii) 4 x 927 x 25 = 927 x (4 x 25) (Associative law of multiplication)

= 927 x 100

= 92700

(iii) 625 x 20 x 8 x 50

(By associative law of multiplication)

(625 x 8) x (20 x 50)

= 5000 x 1000

= 5000000

(iv) 574 x (625 x 16)

= 574 x 10000

= 5740000

(v) 250 x 60 x 50 x 8

= (250 x 8) x (60 x 50)

(By associative law)

= 2000 x 3000

= 6000000

(vi) 8 x 125 x 40 x 25

= (8 x 125) x (40 x 25)

= 1000 x 1000

= 1000000

**Question 5.****Solution:**

Using distributive law of multiplication over addition or subtraction,

(i) 740 x 105

= 740 x (100 + 5)

= 740 x 100 + 740 x 5

= 74000 + 3700

= 77700

(ii) 245 x 1008

= 245 x (1000 + 8)

= 245 x 1000 + 245 x 8

= 245000 + 1960

= 246960

(iii) 947 x 96

= 947 x (100 – 4)

= 947 x 100 – 947 x 4

= 94700 – 3788

= 90912

(iv) 996 x 367

= 367 x (1000 – 4)

= 367 x 1000 – 367 x 4

= 367000 – 1468

= 365532

(v) 472 x 1097

= 472 x (1100 – 3)

= 472 x 1100 – 472 x 3

= 519200 – 1416

= 517784

(vi) 580 x 64

= 580 x (60 + 4)

= 580 x 60 + 580 x 4

= 34800 + 2320

= 37120

(vii) 439 x 997

= 437 x (1000 – 3)

= 439 x 1000 – 439 x 3

= 439000 – 1317

= 437683

(viii) 1553 x 198

= 1553 x (200 – 2)

= 1553 x 200 – 1553 x 2

= 310600 – 3106

= 307494

**Question 6.****Solution:**

(i) 3576 x 9 = 3576 x (10 – 1)

= 3576 x 10 – 3576 x 1

= 35760 – 3576

= 32184

(ii) 847 x 99 = 84 x (100 – 1)

= 847 x 100 – 847 x 1

= 84700 – 847

= 83853

(iii) 2437 x 999 = 2437 x (1000 – 1)

= 2437 x 1000 – 2437 x 1

= 2437000 – 2437

= 2434563

**Question 7.****Solution:**

**Question 8.****Solution:**

Largest 3-digit number = 999

Largest 5-digit number = 99999

Required product = 99999 x 999

= 99999 x (1000 – 1)

= 99999 x 1000-99999 x 1

= 99999000 – 99999

= 9,98,99,001

**Question 9.****Solution:**

Speed of car = 75 km per hour

In 1 hour, distance covered by a car = 75 km

.’. In 98 hours, distance will be covered = 75 x 98

= 75 x (100 – 2)

= 75 x 100 – 75 x 2

= 7500 – 150

= 7350 km

**Question 10.****Solution:**

Cost of 1 set of VCR = Rs. 24350

Cost of 139 sets of VCR = Rs. 24350 x 139

= Rs. 3384650

**Question 11.****Solution:**

Cost of 1 house = Rs. 450000

Cost of 197 houses = Rs. 450000 x 197

= Rs. 450000 x (200 – 3)

= Rs. (450000 x 200 – 450000 x 3)

= Rs. (90000000 – 1350000)

= Rs. 88650000

**Question 12.****Solution:**

Cost of each chair = Rs. 1065

Cost of 50 chairs = Rs. 1065 x 50

= Rs. 53250

Cost of each blackboard = Rs. 1645

Cost of 30 blackboards = Rs. 1645 x 30

= Rs. 49350

Total cost of 50 chairs and 30 blackboards = Rs. 53250 + 49350

= Rs. 102600

**Question 13.****Solution:**

Number of students in 1 section = 45

Number of students in 6 sections = 45 x 6 = 270

Monthly charges of 1 student = Rs. 1650

Total monthly incomes from the class VI = Rs. 270 x 1650

= Rs. (300 – 30) x 1650

= Rs. (1650 x 300 – 1650 x 30)

= Rs. (495000 – 49500)

= Rs. 445500

**Question 14.****Solution:**

Since the product of two whole numbers is zero

.’. From multiplicative property of zero, we conclude that one of the whole numbers is zero.

**Question 15.****Solution:**

(i) Sum of two odd numbers is an even number.

(ii) Product of two odd numbers is an odd number.

(iii) a x a = a => a = 1 as 1 x 1 = 1

**All Chapter RS Aggarwal Solutions For Class 6 Maths**

—————————————————————————–**All Subject NCERT Exemplar Problems Solutions For Class 6**

**All Subject NCERT Solutions For Class 6**

*************************************************

I think you got complete solutions for this chapter. If You have any queries regarding this chapter, please comment on the below section our subject teacher will answer you. We tried our best to give complete solutions so you got good marks in your exam.

If these solutions have helped you, you can also share rsaggarwalsolutions.in to your friends.